Financial history THE H & Y PHILLIPS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.94k £6.90k £7.70k £8.93k £9.59k
Total expenditure £7.83k £5.50k £834 £1.67k £12.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A