LIVING WORD EVANGELISTIC MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main thrust of the charity is Christian teaching both in England and abroad. We apply our teaching in practical ways by sponsorship for orphans and girls rescued from brothels in India, help with education in Kenya and in sending aid, when able, to assist widows, pastors and their families, and relief for disaster areas in India, Kenya and Malawi.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- India
- Kenya
- Malawi
Governance
- 26 May 1989: Standard registration
- 04 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.18k | £9.32k | £9.44k | £7.39k | £5.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.53k | £9.33k | £9.76k | £11.37k | £6.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 26 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 APRIL 1983.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE AS FOLLOWS: A) THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD, AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE. B) THE ORGANISATION, SPONSORSHIP AND PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN WORK THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE. C) TO SEEK TO PRESENT THE GOSPEL TO EVERY CREATURE BY EVERY MEANS POSSIBLE AND TO LEAD MEN, WOMEN AND CHILDREN TO A SAVING FAITH IN OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST. D) TO SEEK. TO TEACH, COUNSEL, INSTRUCT AND HELP AND ENCOURAGE CHRISTIANS TO GROW IN FAITH AND IN A LIFE OF COMMITTED DISCIPLESHIP IN THE SERVICE OF GOD. E) TO SERVE THE CHRISTIAN CHURCH BY PREACHING, BIBLE TEACHING, COUNSELLING, PRAYER AND EVERY MEANS AVAILABLE, TO ENCOURAGE THEM AND LEAD IN EVANGELISM WITNESS AND SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY. F) TO PROMOTE CHRISTIAN WORK AMONG CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE AGED UNDERPRIVILEGED INFIRM OR MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED DRUG ADDICTS ALCOHOLICS OR ANYONE IN NEED BY ANY MEANS CONSISTENT WITH OUR STATEMENT OF BELIEF. G) TO BRING CHRISTIANS INTO THE KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCE OF THE WORK AND POWER OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND A DEEPER EXPERIENCE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE LORD. H) TO PROMOTE ORGANISE AND CONDUCT CRUSADES SERVICES AND OTHER MEETINGS FOR THE AFORESAID PURPOSES. I) TO PURCHASE OR PRINT AND DISTRIBUTE SUITABLE LITERATURE CONSISTENT WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF FOR THE FORESAID PURPOSES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED.)
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window