Financial history THOMPSON B1 LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 326367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £37.36k £1.58k £4.73k £16.92k £31.94k
Total expenditure £24.36k £18.45k £10.42k £23.76k £67.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A