Accounts and annual returns PRO ECCLESIA ET PONTIFICE

Charity number: 326394
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2019 27 March 2021 417 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 14 October 2019 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not Required