THE CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE ASSOCIATION OF THE PUPILS OF ROSEMARY COBHAM C S B

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. FOR PROMOTING AND EXTENDING THE RELIGION OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE AS TAUGHT BY MARY BAKER EDDY IN THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE TEXTBOOK "SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES". 2. FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF THE SAID RELIGION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Trevor John Sutton | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vera Meserle | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Truman West | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Christian Robin Vincent | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan E Schopp | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.84k | £1.44k | £1.58k | £24.62k | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.63k | £5.30k | £6.52k | £27.82k | £14.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 OCTOBER 1983
Charitable objects
1. FOR PROMOTING AND EXTENDING THE RELIGION OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE AS TAUGHT BY MARY BAKER EDDY IN THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE TEXTBOOK "SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES". 2. FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF THE SAID RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 CHURCH LANE
MUNDESLEY
NORWICH
NR11 8AU
- Phone:
- 07380907385
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window