THE FORBES CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide benefits for people with learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bimal Kumar Saurabhkumar Patel | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Riley | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rintoul | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Jeremy Doggett | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Mark Christopher Morris FCA | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Martin Wallace | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richards Johnson BA FCA | Trustee | 16 November 2003 |
|
|||||
JOHN MAXWELL WAITE | Trustee | 16 November 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.40k | £243.87k | £236.23k | £262.60k | £253.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £272.04k | £214.40k | £296.54k | £273.13k | £253.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 DECEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 1ST MARCH 2000 as amended on 08 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR TO OR FOR SUC OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM OR OTHERWISE FOR THE RELIEF OF MENTAL DISORDER SICKNESS IMPAIRMENT OR HANDICAP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Market Place
Week St. Mary
HOLSWORTHY
Cornwall
EX22 6XT
- Phone:
- 07749642664
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window