THE SPRINGS DANCE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's principle activities are: (1) To explore, through dance, faith and life issues from a Christian perspective. (2) To encourage dance within the church, education and the community. (3) To pursue artistic and educational excellence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Italy
- Netherlands
Governance
- 20 February 1984: Standard registration
- 18 April 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 April 2011: Funds transferred to 1136487 SPRINGS DANCE COMPANY
- SPRINGS DANCE COMPANY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/07/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.00k | £122.07k | £175.99k | £148.12k | £37.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.58k | £98.54k | £149.78k | £161.64k | £83.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 13 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 26 April 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 08 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 15 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 15 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 07 October 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL THROUGH THE ART OF DANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window