THE METAMORPHIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Metamorphic Technique to the general public through seminars, workshops and literature. To promote awareness, understanding and use of the Metamorphic technique in the UK and internationally and to uphold standards in practising and teaching the Technique.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Jersey
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 17 February 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MORAG MACKAY | Chair | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Calver | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sara Clarkson | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jane Hinchliffe | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.05k | £11.45k | £6.38k | £4.63k | £3.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.11k | £226 | £1.15k | £5.24k | £4.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 DEC 1983 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF THE FORM OF MASSAGE KNOWN AS THE METAMORPHIC TECHNIQUE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Metamorphic Association
124 City Road
London
EC1V 2NJ
- Phone:
- 44(0)203 962 5714
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window