Financial history ELLA AND ABRAHAM BENNETT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.84k £1.78k £1.73k £1.81k £1.77k
Total expenditure £2.11k £483 £4.04k £3.71k £2.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A