THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATIONS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development and maintenance of a worldwide network of information and human resources dedicated to developing, expanding and transferring the knowledge, technology and impact of human resource development throughout national and multi-national professional, educational, governmental and commercial organisations and their members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Canada
- Cyprus
- Egypt
- Finland
- Germany
- Ghana
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kuwait
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Saudi Arabia
- Singapore
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 09 August 1984: Standard registration
- I F T D O (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lai Mun Fatt Lai | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohamed Mahmood Mohamed Shaikh | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Valais | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ravi Ranjan Kumar Guru | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Naveen Lakshmaiya Mr | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Atul Shah | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheikh Faleigh Sheikh Mansor | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayush Gupta | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chien Chung Shen | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Haidamous Wafaa | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tayo Ola George | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vinayshil Gautam | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raed Khanfar | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Phillips | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Iyabo Kofo Jolaoso | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ghalib Saif Alhosni | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helmi Sallam | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
TAYO ROTIMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.24k | £48.79k | £72.12k | £39.05k | £45.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.33k | £35.82k | £59.06k | £26.13k | £57.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD JULY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 21ST AUGUST 1985 AND 26TH AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY PROMOTING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROMOTION OF TRAINING AND PLANNED PROCESSES TO ACHIEVE EFFECTIVE PERFORMANCE BY INDIVIDUALS OF TASKS AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO REALISE THEIR ABILITIES IN COPING WITH THE WORK OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
S 50
GREATER KAILASH - 1
NEW DELHI
INDIA
- Phone:
- +911141619842
- Email:
- ukkohli@yahoo.co.in
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window