Financial history CHASDEI YOEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £237.44k £228.74k £113.16k £187.38k £221.15k
Total expenditure £133.20k £193.77k £122.37k £189.16k £201.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.40k N/A N/A N/A