Accounts and annual returns DENTAL RADIOLOGY CONGRESSES (UK)

Charity number: 326639
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2017 12 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 19 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 23 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required