Financial history DENTAL RADIOLOGY CONGRESSES (UK)

Charity number: 326639
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2013 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017
Total gross income £3 £2 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £13 £13 £13 £0 £86
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0