CENTRE FOR RESEARCH INTO COMMUNIST ECONOMIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the CRCE are to examine solutions for problems of the post-communist (and those extant communist) countries. Research must help with the task of building new systems and policies. The Centre organises symposia and seminars and since 1989 has produced its scholarly quarterly journal, Post-Communist Economies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
- Slovenia
Governance
- 02 August 1984: Standard registration
- 07 June 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CENTRE FOR RESEARCH INTO POST-COMMUNIST ECONOMIES (Working name)
- THE CENTRE FOR RESEARCH INTO COMMUNIST ECONOMIES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.76k | £42.45k | £40.31k | £19.36k | £1.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.06k | £39.34k | £39.00k | £25.63k | £11.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 09 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 06 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 16 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 29 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 01 May 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JULY 1984
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND LEARNING BY RESEARCH INTO THE OPERATION OF ECONOMIC POLICIES OF COUNTRIES WITH COMMUNIST GOVERNMENTS AND THE ANALYSIS OF THEIR ACHIEVEMENTS AND PROBLEMS AS THE BASIS FOR COMPARATIVE STUDIES AND THE PUBLICATION OF SUCH STUDIES. SEE TRUST DEED FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window