Financial history FAITH WORD MINISTRY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 326651
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2008 30/04/2009 30/04/2010 30/04/2011 30/04/2012
Total gross income £389 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £409 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A