ROYAL CHESTER ROWING CLUB TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust by Deed was established to assist young people in full time education realise their potential in rowing as a sport, whether at recreational or international level. Generally, the Trust is able to assist by providing appropriate equipment or a financial contribution towards travel or training expenses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 10 September 1984: Standard registration
- Royal Chester Rowing Club Young People's Trust (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Boothman | Chair |
|
||||||
Chloe Alice Sheward | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Charles Hardie | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON HUGH PARRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CECIL DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
John McGarva | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN ARTHUR GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ROBERT JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.18k | £205 | £2.09k | £2.22k | £330 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.91k | £0 | £1.39k | £7.36k | £2.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JUNE 1984
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE FUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC FOR THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES IN ANY PART OF THE BRITISH ISLES BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THAT OBJECT TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH PERSONS TO ROW AND/OR SCULL. 2 IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE BRITISH ISLES
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 WOODLANDS DRIVE
CHESTER
CH2 3QL
- Phone:
- 01244319931
- Email:
- johnfboothman@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window