THE ABBEY MANOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 October 1984: Standard registration
- THE BARTLETT CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A R S TIMMIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
N R S TIMMIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/09/2020 | 25/09/2021 | 25/09/2022 | 25/09/2023 | 25/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6 | £6 | £8 | £33 | £101 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.79k | £4.29k | £6.35k | £6.92k | £5.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 September 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 September 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 2 MARCH 2000 AND 24 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG EMPLOYEES FORMER EMPLOYEES AND WIDOWS AND DEPENDENTS OF EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE COMPANY OR ANY OF THE COMPANY'S SUBSIDIARY OR ASSOCIATED COMPANIES (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) THE ESTABLISHMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ABBEY
PRESTON ROAD
YEOVIL
SOMERSET
BA20 2EN
- Phone:
- 01935424251
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window