THE UPLANDS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping other charities ---social and local chuches and other Christian charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 20 December 1984: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £412 | £210 | £216 | £207 | £170 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £1.50k | £3.00k | £1.50k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 29 March 2017 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 DECEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FORM TIME TO ETIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window