The White Flame Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was formed to help people from all backgrounds, all religions, and spiritual persuasions to be more conscious and spiritually aware. It is an Educational Trust. We offer free courses and conscious information via social media and online, plus 121 healing, counselling, coaching and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 January 1985: Standard registration
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 September 2019: Re-registered
- SHAMBHALA CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- THE SHAMBHALA TRUST (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Andrew David Petrie Mr | Chair | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stellar Esme Fairbairn | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Stopps | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600 | £800 | £1.20k | £5.25k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.63k | £3.42k | £1.17k | £5.25k | £2.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2022 | 447 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH MAY 1984 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 21ST JANUARY 1986 as amended on 16 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIGIOUS, MORAL AND SPIRITUAL EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND ANY OTHER OBJECTS WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tai Cottage
Coursing Batch
Glastonbury
BA6 8BH
- Phone:
- 07899870023
- Email:
- davidrstopps@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window