THE SKELTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to other charities and voluntary bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 May 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY CHARLES PHILIP WHARTON | Chair |
|
||||||
Claire Mason | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Colver | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.38k | £750 | £1.38k | £3.38k | £2.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £1.37k | £1.46k | £3.01k | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 11 JANUARY 1985.
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL THEREOF AND THE INCOME THEREOF TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THOSE SPECIFIED IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE AND IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE...
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESTATE OFFICE
NORTH TERRACE
SKELTON-IN-CLEVELAND
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA CLEVELAND
TS12 2ES
- Phone:
- 01287650241
- Email:
- claire@skeltonestates.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window