THE UHLMAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial assistance given to large walled garden in Herefordshire open to public eight months per year - 100,000 visitors on National Trust Estate each year. Donations to educational causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 April 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRISTRAM LUDOVIC ARCHER COMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH HARRIET EDDIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190 | £121 | £53 | £987 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £300 | £172 | £66 | £39 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ART, MUSIC AND HISTORICAL REASEARCH AND IN NATURE CONSERVATION AND THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF HISTORIC BUILDINGS AND THEIR SURROUNDINGS AND CONTENTS BY PROMOTING AND ASSISTING OTHER BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS BEING CHARITIES WHOSE OBJECTS ARE OR INCLUDE THE FUTHERING OF SUCH OBJECTS. (FOR RURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Flat, Croft Castle
Yarpole
LEOMINSTER
Herefordshire
HR6 9PW
- Phone:
- 01568780287
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window