THE CHILDWICK TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are given to charities in England to assist people with disabilities, the elderly in need plus adults and children who are seriously ill. The Trust also supports the welfare of people involved in the horseracing industry. The Trust also supports Jewish people in need within the UK and pre-school educational projects in South Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- South Africa
Governance
- 29 July 1985: Standard registration
- 05 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1150413 THE CHILDWICK TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.29m | £1.85m | £1.99m | £1.72m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.97m | £3.12m | £3.08m | £2.99m | £77.43m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £69.27k | £95.87k | £160.76k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.22m | £1.75m | £1.81m | £1.57m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £21.77k | £147.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.86m | £2.76m | £2.73m | £2.65m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.68k | £39.09k | £47.25k | £39.62k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £74.53k | £325.74k | £306.81k | £304.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 25 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 07 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 28 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 10 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 23 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | 25 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 10 APRIL 1985 AMENDED 24 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND 23 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO ASSIST THE AGED IN NEED INCLUDING THE FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE SETTLER AND OF COMPANIES ASSOCIATED WITH THE SETTLER AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH FORMER EMPLOYEES. (B) TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO CHARITIES OR FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTS CONNECTED WITH HORSE RACING OR HORSE BREEDING WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR PEOPLE INVOLVED WITH HORSE RACING OR HORSE BREEDING WHO SHALL BE IN NEED. (C) TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF JEWISH CHARITIES FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE JEWISH FAITH OR SUPPORT OF JEWS IN NEED WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (D) TO SUPPORT CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF PEOPLE AND THE FAMILIES OF PEOPLE WHO INTEND TO WORK ARE WORKING OR HAVE WORKED IN THE MINING INDUSTRY IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA. (E) TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE RESIDENT IN SOUTH AFRICA AND TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND SCHOLARSHIPS FOR SUCH INDIVIDUALS TO ASSIST THEM IN THEIR EDUCATION WHETHER IN SOUTH AFRICA OR ELSEWHERE. (F) TO MAKE PAYMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITIES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND PARTICULARLY FOR THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window