THE PELEGRIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to advance religion and education by printing or reprinting books of religious or educational content.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 July 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEIDRE NAIRN RUST | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Annabelle Scofield | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
TONY SCOFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.77k | £14.25k | £15.24k | £15.73k | £18.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.25k | £22.49k | £29.32k | £25.00k | £42.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 2 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE EXISTING GOVERNING DOCUMENT WILL TAKE EFFECT WITH: (1) CLAUSE 5(A), (B) AND (C) DELETED AND REPLACED WITH: ¶5. (A) TO ADVANCE RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING DONATIONS TO ASSIST RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE TRUSTS TO FINANCE PUBLICATIONS; AND (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE RELIGIOUS, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND PARA-PSYCHOLOGICAL FIELDS OF EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.÷
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SYCAMORE COTTAGE
TAMLEY LANE
HASTINGLEIGH
ASHFORD
TN25 5HW
- Phone:
- 01233 750363
- Email:
- mddn@studiorust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window