Accounts and annual returns MRS L C PHILLIPS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity Number: 326897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 11 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 14 November 2024 283 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 November 2024 648 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required