Governing document BRITISH AND IRISH ORTHOPTIC SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 14 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/2014 AS AMENDED ON 09 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ORTHOPTICS AND COGNATE SUBJECTS AND TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND IMPROVE THE PRACTICE OF ORTHOPTICS WITH A VIEW TO MAINTAINING AND RAISING STANDARDS IN CLINICAL AND SCIENTIFIC ORTHOPTICS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.