Accounts and annual returns THE NARGIS DUTT SOCIETY FOR CANCER RELIEF AND RESEARCH

Charity number: 326923
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 December 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required