Accounts and annual returns KINGDOM TRUST

Charity number: 326924
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 13 April 2017 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 13 April 2017 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 28 February 2015 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required