SINDH DOCTORS ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.Voluntary work for the relief of human suffering and human illness by offering free medical/ financial help to in Sindh. 2. To promote and facilitate medical education, research, publications at Sindh. 4. To encourage primary education in rural areas by offering financial donations. 5. To cooperate, federate and encourage Sindhi Doctors promote the honourable cause of this association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
Governance
- 11 February 1986: Standard registration
- 13 January 2016: Funds received from 1039710 SINDHI CULTURAL CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANWER HUSSAIN BALOCH | Trustee | 24 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ZIAUDDIN SHAIKH | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHAHABUDDIN KALHORO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR KAMAR KHAN AFGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR KHALID R LAGHARI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.63k | £217.60k | £151.59k | £339.97k | £190.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.50k | £208.00k | £171.92k | £347.08k | £171.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/09/1985
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL STUDENTS FROM THE SINDH PROVINCE OF PAKISTAN. 2. FOR THE RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND HUMAN ILLNESS IN THE SINDH PROVINCE OF PAKISTAN.
Area of benefit
SINDH PROVINCE OF PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Beechwood Park
London
E18 2EQ
- Phone:
- +447818890185
- Email:
- ziashaikh@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window