JAYNE SAMPSON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational/Training for people with a disability; purchase of a guide dog in memory of Jayne Sampson who died at Bradford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Bradford City
- Leeds City
Governance
- 10 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul David Mann | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Alderton | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Jones | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF GUIDE DOGS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR THE PURCHASE AND TRAINING OF GUIDE DOGS BY THE GUIDE DOGS FOR THE BLIND ASSOCIATION OF ALEXANDRA HOUSE, 9-11 PARK STREET WINDSOR, BERKSHIRE SL4 1JR. 2. TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF BLIND PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES NOT BEING LESS THAN THREE IN NUMBER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Squire Patton Boggs (UK) Llp
6 Wellington Place
LEEDS
LS1 4AP
- Phone:
- 01132847170
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window