Financial history THE GOLDEN BOTTLE TRUST

Charity number: 327026
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £3.79m £135.44k £1.64m £1.75m £6.80m
Total expenditure £2.69m £4.03m £2.36m £2.69m £2.33m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.50m N/A £1.50m £1.50m £6.56m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £3.50m N/A £1.50m £1.50m £6.50m
Income - Investment £287.94k N/A £138.68k £252.07k £235.98k
Income - Other £695 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £61.93k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.64m N/A £2.11m £2.61m £2.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.08k N/A £77.28k £65.55k £49.11k
Expenditure - Governance £13.94k N/A £15.00k £15.19k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.62m N/A £2.09m £2.59m £2.29m
Expenditure - Investment management £56.08k N/A £77.28k £65.55k £49.11k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £171.11k £13.85k £0