INVICTA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants and donations to other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABRAHAM JACOB HIRSCH | Trustee | 25 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
FANNY HELLA HIRSCH | Trustee | 14 March 1986 |
|
|
||||
ELIOT HUGH FEINGOLD | Trustee | 14 March 1986 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.30k | £30.73k | £20.05k | £57.26k | £55.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.61k | £23.45k | £17.59k | £25.19k | £46.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1401 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1401 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND THE RELIGION OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH. (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. (III) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLAND LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
817 FINCHLEY ROAD
LONDON
NW11 8AJ
- Phone:
- 02073283272
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window