Accounts and annual returns SPANISH DANCE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 327049
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On Time