Financial history SPANISH DANCE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 327049
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £52.89k £55.04k £49.24k £48.71k £2.96k
Total expenditure £55.95k £59.02k £58.99k £51.03k £68.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A