Governing document SPANISH DANCE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 327049
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1986, AS AMENDED 9 APRIL 1997, AND BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2017 as amended on 27 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF SPANISH DANCE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.