Financial history THE ROUND SQUARE

Charity number: 327117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.22m £1.10m £1.11m £2.89m £1.54m
Total expenditure £1.22m £997.25k £1.12m £2.88m £1.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £107.07k £12.13k £6.22k £18.92k £39.33k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.49k £1.38k £7.61k £4.59k
Income - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.08m £1.10m £2.86m £1.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.53k £208 £79 £3.04k £10.32k
Income - Other £4.71k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £997.25k £1.12m £2.88m £1.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £61.15k £0 £0 £1.99k £38.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0