Trustees ENGINEERING INTEGRITY SOCIETY
Charity number: 327121

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Yates | Chair | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amir Ebrahim Chahardehi | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Connor Bligh | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Cockrill | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hollie Louise Cockings | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Shenton | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Payne | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Spencer Pendrell Jeffs | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Thomas O'Neill | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Vickers | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Bailey | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Gerald Fish | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Frederick Ensor | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hemmings | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roberts | Trustee | 01 October 2000 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN ROBERT CAWTE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.