THE JONATHAN AND BRENDA EDWARDS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Of gifts and donations amounting to -+¦0, tax recovered of -+¦0 and interest of -+¦2, together with the balance brought forward of -+¦1,377, -+¦0 was applied to charitable purposes leaving a balance of -+¦1,379 available for expenditure in the subsequent year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRENDA IRENE EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL LEONARD BROOKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
TO PAY DISTRIBUTE AND APPLY THE TRUST FUND AND ANY INCOME ARISING FROM OR CAUSE THE SAME TO BE PAID DISTRIBUTES OR APPLIED TO FOR AND AMONG SUCH CHARITABLE SOCIETIES OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THEY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AND PROPORTIONS AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT DURING HIS LIFE-TIME THE SETTLOR MAY DIRECT HOW SUCH DISCRETION SHOULD BE EXERCISED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 NORBURY AVENUE
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST2 7BJ
- Phone:
- 01782545954
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window