THE RELIEF SOCIETY FOR POLES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To sponsor, promote welfare of persons of Polish nationality or descent living in the United Kingdom. To make grants to individuals and organisations. To promote religious activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANUSZ SIKORA-SIKORSKI KCSG | Chair |
|
||||||||
Marzena Legezynska | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Piotr Bronislaw Rejek | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Wisniowski | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
MRS KOC LAWDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.88k | £3.44k | £525 | £38.48k | £49.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.72k | £85.21k | £38.33k | £49.07k | £51.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH AND IN PARTICULAR FOR (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY NEED DISTRESS AND SICKNESS BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING TECHNICAL CULTURAL PHYSICAL AND VOCATIONAL EDUCATION) AND (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AMONG POLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RELIEF SOCIETY FOR POLES TRU
55 PRINCES GATE
LONDON
SW7 2PN
- Phone:
- 02075898846
- Email:
- relief.society@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window