Financial history THE FISHBORN TRUST

Charity number: 327142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.55k £5.22k £2.55k £2.29k £1.62k
Total expenditure £2.08k £4.63k £1.43k £2.36k £3.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A