MIT DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MIT Development Trust receives contributions from UK based donors and transfers them to the Massachusetts Institute of Technology in the USA in a tax efficient manner by the reclaimation of Gift Aid from the UK government
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 July 1986: Standard registration
- 02 September 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.21k | £71.54k | £88.40k | £168.83k | £88.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.17k | £68.51k | £88.40k | £189.51k | £94.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 03 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 03 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 14 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 14 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 03 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 03 September 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND, SUBJECT TO THE TERMS ON WHICH ANY SPECIAL DONATION IS RECIEVED UNDER SUB-CLAUSE (C) OF CLAUSE 9 HEREOF, TO OR FOR:- A THE FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF SUCH OF THE PURPOSES OF MIT AS ARE CHARITABLE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS THE TERM IS UNDERSTOOD IN ENGLISH LAW BY WAY OF GIFT, GRANT, LOAN, GUARANTEE OR SUCH OTHER FORM OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FOR THE MAINTENANCE, EXPANSION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MIT AND ITS ACTIVITIES CALCULATED TO ACHIEVE SUCH PURPOSES, OR B SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TERM IS UNDERSTOOD IN ENGLISH LAW CONNECTED WITH MIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window