ANANDA MARGA UNIVERSAL RELIEF TEAM (AMURT) UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a program to feed homeless and needy persons in London We fundraise for global disaster relief We fundraise to support development projects run by sister AMURT chapters We run a health-food store in Stoke Newington (Food for All) whose operating surplus goes to support our activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £28,764 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 1986: Standard registration
- AMURT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grace Collins | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
P Elizabeth Driscoll | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PIERRE HARRY CAINE BOYDE | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Reiter | Trustee |
|
||||||
Anthony Edward Lovage | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.57k | £141.01k | £160.94k | £279.32k | £256.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.12k | £132.50k | £149.89k | £216.68k | £254.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £39.98k | £15.00k | £28.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARTION OF TRUST DATED THE 9 JULY 1986
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS RESIDENT BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN UNDERDEVELOPED COUNTRIES AND IN PARTICULAR TO RELIEVE SINGLE HOMELESS PERSONS IN LONDON AND PERSONS IN UNDERDEVELOPED COUNTRIES AFFECTED BY FAMINE OR OTHER REGIONAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONL DISATERS BE THEY NATURAL OR MAN-MADE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND UNDERDEVELOPTED COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
3A CAZENOVE ROAD
LONDON
N16 6PA
- Phone:
- 02088064250
- Email:
- ask@amurt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window