EASTMAN FOUNDATION FOR ORAL RESEARCH AND TRAINING (EFFORT)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports and promotes research and education in oral health at the UCL Eastman Dental Institute
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 August 1986: Standard registration
- 22 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EFFORT (Working name)
- EASTMAN DENTAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE EASTMAN RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £618 | £584 | £654 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £49 | £78 | £78 | £78 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 August 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 17 January 2020 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 22 MARCH 1993, 1ST JUNE 1994, 27TH JANUARY 1999 AND 13TH NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE BY ALL AVAILABLE MEANS THE PREVENTION AND STUDY OF DISEASE (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THIS CLAUSE) DISEASES OF THE ORAL AND DENTAL TISSUES AND ALLIED STRUCTURES AND ALLIED SUBJECTS AND GENERALLY TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE MEANS OF PREVENTION DIAGNOSIS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT AND CURE OF SUCH DISEASES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3(2) & (3)).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window