THE MUSLIM YOUTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of worship. Organises religious programmes. Collections for relief agencies. Educational visits for schools. Various social, cultural programmes. Activities for deaf group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
Governance
- 07 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMED ABDUL MALEK | Chair | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hammadur Rahman Fahim | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gadri Audhali | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Mehmood Mughal | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr MUNTASIR FAYEZ AL-HAMAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.46k | £91.46k | £49.21k | £120.38k | £145.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.92k | £87.23k | £77.04k | £98.93k | £114.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.77k | £46.93k | £3.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD JULY 1983
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ANDTHE TEACHINGS OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION. (FOR FURTHER DETAILES PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 4 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLYDESDALE HOUSE
27 TURNER STREET
MANCHESTER
M4 1DY
- Phone:
- 01618325352
- Email:
- office@myf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window