The Peter Greenwood Memorial Trust for Deaf People

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust supports deaf people who wish to continue or return to study. It does this by making small cash grants to individuals, to buy books and equipment to support them in their studies, and to organisations that work with deaf people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 October 1986: Standard registration
- THE PETER GREENWOOD MEMORIAL TRUST FOR THE DEAF (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ball | Chair | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Hart | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pulford | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Robinson | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Greenwood | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Rik Leedale | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.32k | £829 | £74 | £512 | £2.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £3.76k | £1.28k | £3.63k | £3.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 22 MARCH 2010 as amended on 16 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HEARING IMPAIRED STUDENTS FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE BY PROVIDING BURSARIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUCH REGULATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE TO ASSIST SUCH STUDENTS TO PURSUE COURSES OR ACTIVITIES IN SECONDARY, HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION, OR TRAINING IN ENGLAND AND WALES, OR GRANTS TO GROUPS OR ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH COURSES OR ACTIVITIES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3).
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 All Hallows Road
Walkington
BEVERLEY
HU17 8SJ
- Phone:
- 01482866269
- Email:
- info@pgmtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window