Accounts and annual returns PLUMBLINE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 327271
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 17 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 March 2021 On Time