PLUMBLINE MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the Christian faith through: Support of existing churches including training and equipping through seminars, camps etc.; Establishing new chruches and Christian ministries; Support of churches, Christian Ministries and missionaries overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Suffolk
- France
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 November 1986: Standard registration
- 06 February 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 06 February 2025: Funds transferred to 803355 HUNTINGDONSHIRE COMMUNITY CHURCH
- PLUMBLINE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- PLUMBLINE (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.26k | £57.53k | £67.84k | £62.53k | £48.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.47k | £56.11k | £72.86k | £61.54k | £67.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 AUGUST 1986.AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 8TH DECEMBER 1990.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED DATED 21 AUGUST 1986).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window