Financial history MINISTRY OF RESTORATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £83.54k £92.57k £141.28k £92.21k £85.04k
Total expenditure £88.08k £88.49k £77.82k £85.61k £91.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A