MINISTRY OF RESTORATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Promotion and progression of Christianity by advancing the Christian religion with a view that all mankind will be restored to the knowledge of God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- Nottinghamshire
- Barbados
- Jamaica
- Nigeria
Governance
- 01 December 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE DYER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN DYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOEL DYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.54k | £92.57k | £141.28k | £92.21k | £85.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.08k | £88.49k | £77.82k | £85.61k | £91.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2024 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2024 | 225 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2023 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2023 | 225 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEP 1986 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01 JUN 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST THE MESSIAH BY ESTABLISHING CHURCHES AND USING ANY MEDIUM DEEMED NECESSARY AND CONDUCIVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINISTRY OF RESTORATION
INTERNATIONAL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH
138 HIGHAM HILL ROAD
LONDON
E17 6EJ
- Phone:
- 02085270381
- Email:
- admin@morchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window