THE T I F TOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Established to make grants for charitable purposes usually within the Merseyside and Wirral Area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £4,430
Total expenditure: £222

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LCVS Trustee
THE FELLOWSHIP FARM GUEST HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PILKINGTON JONES CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
THE RICHARD BEHREND CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE TAVENER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHN AND SHENAGH NORMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MRS F M KAYE-KRZECZKOWSKI CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SUTCLIFFE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DEREK AND CHRIS BUNTING FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE EMERALD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE TOPAZ CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ANBER FUND
Received: On time
THE HARDING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FULTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MRS R J BRADLEY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE SHONE NO.2 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MISS A M HARDING'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE SIR ANDREW MARTIN TRUST FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Received: On time
THE WHITLOCK BLUNDELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MRS M J CUNNAH'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE SHEBA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DAVID FRYER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CAROLINE TOD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SUSAN BIBBY FUND
Received: On time
THE SHARPLES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RUSHWORTH TRUST
Received: On time
THE CECIL TAYLOR FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE B R JARDINE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHN BEHREND FUND
Received: On time
MRS E C LANCELEY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MARGARET E MOSS FUND
Received: On time
UW GIVING
Received: On time
THE M E HAWKES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DOVE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE M J RIDGES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ADAM C I NAYLOR CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
UNITED TRUSTS
Received: On time
THE WILLIAM EDMONDS FUND
Received: On time
THE MUSHROOM FUND
Received: On time
THE R CHRISTOPHER NAYLOR (HARRIET) FUND
Received: On time
THE PENELOPE JONES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHINLATTER FUND
Received: On time
THE SANSAW AND HARDWICKE CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
THE ROBERT ORR CRICHTON TRUST
Received: On time
THE R CHRISTOPHER NAYLOR (THOMAS) FUND
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL AUXILIARY PENSION FUND
Received: On time
THE ROBERT DAVIES TRUST
Received: On time
THE R H HOBHOUSE FUND
Received: On time
THE STANDFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HENRY BIRCH FUND
Received: On time
THE TREFULA TRUST FUND (PREVIOUSLY THE G E TREGONING FUND)
Received: On time
HELEN NILSEN FUND
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL DISPENSARIES FUND
Received: On time
THE N L ARTHURSON FUND
Received: On time
THE NEIL JONES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MACAMISH TRUST
Received: On time
LESLIE BIBBY FUND
Received: On time
THE J A SHONE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
J B BIBBY FUND
Received: On time
THE DAVID LEWIS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SIR HARRY PILKINGTON FUND
Received: On time
HARVEY-HUGHES JONES FUND
Received: On time
THE BRIAN JAMES FUND
Received: On time
THE SELWYN-LLOYD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
R G HETHERINGTON FUND
Received: On time
H J RAWLINGS TRUST
Received: On time
THE DAVID AND RUTH BEHREND FUND
Received: On time
THE AGED WOMEN'S PENSIONS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE A L GRANT 1ST CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
EDWARD BIBBY FUND
Received: On time
THE ANDREW JONES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PETER BIBBY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RUSHWORTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CLAIRE MCKEEVER TRUST
Received: On time
H B BICKET CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GEORGETTE WRIGHT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WOODLANDS POETIC TRUST
Received: On time
THE KITCHEN TABLE CHARITIES TRUST
Received: On time
Caroline Jane Lucy Tod Trustee
THE HEMBY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHESHIRE COUNTY LAWN TENNIS ASSOCIATION YOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
JAMES BUCHANAN TOD Trustee
None on record
JONATHAN ALAN TOD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.67k £4.78k £3.95k £4.03k £4.43k
Total expenditure £21.38k £239 £197 £201 £222
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 02 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 May 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
151 DALE STREET
LIVERPOOL
L2 2AH
Phone:
01512275177
Email:
No information available