Accounts and annual returns THE MIRIAM ROTHSCHILD AND JOHN FOSTER HUMAN RIGHTS TRUST

Charity number: 327301
Charity reporting is overdue by 1595 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 501 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 501 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 866 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 866 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1231 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1231 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1595 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1595 days